MD HB1413 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the City of Laurel to participate in the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel PG 311-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB753 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14801(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14803(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback