MD HB1412 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that the Maryland Transit Administration must regularly consult with certain entities regarding the compilation and submission of the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a draft Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan to certain entities at least a certain period of time before the finalization of the Plan; altering the contents and elements of the Plan; altering the time frame that the Plan must address; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (93-45)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {353426/1 (Delegate Korman) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {404867/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback