MD HB1410 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain trustees or officers of the Upper Potomac River Commission to invest and reinvest certain money in their custody or control in accordance with rules or procedures established by the Commission; requiring any pension plan controlled by the Commission on or after July 1, 2019, to adhere to the principles incorporated in the Uniform Management of Public Employee Retirement Systems Act that address the investment and management of funds for a public pension system; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-04-05SenateHearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-13HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback