MD HB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each residential service agency, beginning July 1, 2022, to ensure that within 45 days of the start of employment individuals receive training relating to dementia; providing that certain training may be provided by a certain supervisory staff member; providing that a residential service agency is not required to provide certain individuals certain training under certain circumstances; requiring a person who provides certain training to issue a certification of completion to each individual who completes the training; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {456889/1 Adopted |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-08-31 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB275 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Subjects
Certifications
Disabilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Home Care Services
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Work, Labor, and Employment
Disabilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Home Care Services
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 4A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 4A-03.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |