MD HB1409 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Director of Finance for Prince George's County to distribute certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to the Community Crisis Services, Inc.; requiring certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to be used to fund battered spouse shelters and domestic violence programs if the Community Crisis Services, Inc., changes its name or objectives or ceases to exist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateMotion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Benson) Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (129-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-24HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law2404(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback