MD HB1409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the amount of the school facilities surcharge in Howard County for certain types of residential construction; authorizing the County Council of Howard County to enact a local law providing for the annual alteration of the amount of the school facilities surcharge based on consideration of certain issues; prohibiting the County Council from imposing a school facilities surcharge on residential new construction that is classified as senior housing and an affordable housing unit under certain provisions of the County Code; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (136-2)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback