MD HB1408 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding to study and design a process for determining instances in which the benefits provided to the historic preservation of the Ellicott City Historic District by adherence to a certain standard are outweighed by the benefits provided by the adoption of a certain set of measures that allows for a certain exception to the historic preservation standard; etc.
Title
Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding
Sponsors
Del. Bob Flanagan [R] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {420417/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Death
Flood Control
Historical Matters
Howard County
Insurance
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Safety
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Death
Flood Control
Historical Matters
Howard County
Insurance
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Safety
Sunset