MD HB1408 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the prohibition against keeping a dwelling, a building, a vehicle, a vessel, an aircraft, or any other place resorted to by individuals for the purpose of administering illegally controlled dangerous substances to remove the prohibition from provisions relating to common nuisance; and altering a specified penalty.
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (76-64) (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (76-64) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Aircraft
Boats and Ships
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Housing
Motor Vehicles
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Boats and Ships
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Housing
Motor Vehicles
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences