MD HB1407 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the composition, powers, and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the State Board of Electricians; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish the education requirements and qualifications for a journeyperson electrician license; requiring the Board to adopt a State electrical code; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a certain local electrical code; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-08HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback