MD HB1406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local jurisdiction to address middle housing as a component of the housing element of a certain plan; and requiring the housing element of a certain plan to state the number of additional housing units the local jurisdiction will need by a certain point in time based on certain forecasts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (99-35)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {770819/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use3114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback