MD HB1404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to appropriate $1,600,000 to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in each of fiscal years 2020 and 2021; establishing the Workgroup on the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra; requiring the Workgroup to examine structural efficiencies of the Orchestra, including health care costs and facility usage; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations regarding cost containment and audience development in a consolidated financial report to certain committees of the General Assembly by October 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-28) (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-29) (Y: 107 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (109-28)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {789232/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (106-29)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {754767/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1404&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1404f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1404t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1404e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1404_75476701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1404_78923201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1404.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1404_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0537.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1404_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1329.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1523.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback