MD HB1401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor in fiscal years 2024 through 2026 to include an appropriation of $750,000 in the annual budget bill to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to be used as an operating grant to the National Center for Victims of Crime to create and enhance services to victims of crime in Prince George's County; and requiring the Office by December 15, 2026 to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on the effectiveness of the use of the funds.
Title
Prince George’s County – National Center for Victims of Crime – Funding
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Victims
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |