MD HB1401 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to determine that a vehicle or combination of vehicles transporting certain freight is an indivisible load authorized to obtain a certain overweight vehicle permit under certain circumstances; establishing certain conditions for a vehicle issued a permit under the Act, including a requirement to travel only on roads designated as being part of a "heavy weight port corridor"; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsors
Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. William Wivell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {790319/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Fees
Highways
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Ports
Rules and Regulations
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Highways
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Ports
Rules and Regulations
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures