MD HB1400 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-15)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that participation by certain organizations in the State employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program may not impede, undermine, or conflict with certain obligations or statuses; authorizing an employee of a county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; establishing the Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {447279/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-23SenateReassigned to Finance
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {884463/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1400&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1400f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1400t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1400e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_307_hb1400e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1400_88446301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1400_44727901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb1400.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1400_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0585.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1400_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1224.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1363.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback