MD HB1400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding an exception from licensing by the State Board of Physicians to include a physician who resides in and is authorized to practice medicine by any other state, instead of an adjoining state, and who meets other requirements; establishing an exception from licensing by the Board for a physician who resides in and is authorized to practice medicine by another state and who provides specified services by telemedicine; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Exceptions from Licensing - Physicians Authorized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nonresidents
Physicians
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nonresidents
Physicians
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1400.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1400f.pdf |