MD HB1399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing by $7,000 the compensation of the president, vice president, and other members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education.
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Member Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-28) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {533828/1 (Delegate D. Jones) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB510 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579