MD HB1398 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain residency requirement for an applicant for certain alcoholic beverages licenses in Queen Anne's County; and providing that an individual may not be issued a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license on behalf of a corporation or limited liability company unless the corporation or limited liability company is a Maryland entity in good standing or a foreign entity registered to do business in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages27102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages271403(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback