MD HB1398 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, beginning July 1, 2018, all buoys in the navigable waters of the State be equipped with solar reflective lights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Boat Act - Solar Reflective Lights on Buoys - Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback