MD HB1397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to limit the amount a covered individual is required to pay in copayments or coinsurance for a covered prescription insulin drug to not more than $30 for a 30-day supply.
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243721/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB353 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Drugs
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 15 | 822.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 847.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |