MD HB1391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to prohibit a person convicted of a third or subsequent offense of driving under the influence of alcohol from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system and order the person to install an ignition interlock system on the person's vehicle as a sentence, a part of a sentence, or a condition of probation; requiring a court to order certain motor vehicles to be impounded or immobilized for a certain period under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsors
Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. April Rose [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Law Enforcement
Liens
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Records
Time
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Law Enforcement
Liens
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Records
Time
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving