MD HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of an Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program by a community-based organization to provide a place for the consumption of preobtained drugs, provide sterile needles, administer first aid, and provide certain other services; providing the Maryland Department of Health may approve no more than 6 programs to operate in a single location in an area of high incidence drug use; requiring each program to submit a certain report to certain legislative committees by December 1 of each year; etc.
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
AIDS
Clinics
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Diseases
Education
Emergency Medical Services
Examinations
Forfeiture
Gifts
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Identification
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Opioids
Personal Property
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Real Property
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Safety
Search and Seizure
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Agents and Brokers
AIDS
Clinics
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Diseases
Education
Emergency Medical Services
Examinations
Forfeiture
Gifts
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Identification
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Opioids
Personal Property
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Real Property
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Safety
Search and Seizure
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning