MD HB1388 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a certain Prince George's County public safety surcharge amount is for certain residential housing constructed in an area included in a certain plan or an area that abuts an existing or planned mass transit rail station operated by the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority or the Maryland Transit Administration, instead of requiring the surcharge to be for both areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George’s County – Public Safety Surcharge PG 412–20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 461
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {810210/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Prince George's County10192.11(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback