MD HB1386 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the regulations adopted by the State Board of Education to govern the licensing and operation of child care centers to include provisions that establish certain qualifications for probationary employment for a certain indiviual to be a child care teacher in a certain child care center; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (126-8)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {395268/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB1018 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5404(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback