MD HB1386 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging public schools to post the appropriate telephone number for reporting suspected child abuse or neglect conspicuously in a high-traffic, widely used area of the school; and requiring a county board to ensure that the appropriate telephone number for reporting suspected child abuse or neglect is published in student handbooks and on the website of the county board or local school system.
Title
Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {615261/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Communications
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Publications
Signs and Billboards
Telephones
Communications
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Publications
Signs and Billboards
Telephones