MD HB1385 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Town of Mount Airy, Carroll County and Frederick County, to undertake and carry out certain urban renewal projects for slum clearance and redevelopment; prohibiting certain land or property from being taken for certain purposes without just compensation first being paid to the party entitled to the compensation; declaring that certain land or property taken in connection with certain urban renewal powers is needed for public uses or purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-18HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Municipal CharterA1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1102(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1103(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1104(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1105(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1106(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1107(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1108(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1109(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1110(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1111(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1112(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1113(n/a)See Bill Text
Municipal CharterA1114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback