MD HB1385 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law prohibiting a member of the Washington County Gaming Commission from serving on the gaming commission if the member serves on the board of directors or as an officer of an organization that applies for funds from the gaming commission; requiring the gaming commission to adopt conflict of interest regulations applicable to members of the gaming commission; etc.
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Generally
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Ethics
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Counties - Generally
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Ethics
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Washington County