MD HB1384 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting, to at a minimum from 6 a.m. to midnight, the hours during which a certain person in possession of a vehicle that has been towed or removed from a parking lot is required to provide an opportunity for the vehicle owner or the owner's agent to retake possession of the vehicle; and altering a certain signage requirement imposed on the owner or operator of a parking lot relating to hours during which a towed vehicle may be reclaimed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing or Removal of Vehicles from Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-1)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {450815/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation2110A-02(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2110A-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback