MD HB1382 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a court from committing a child for inpatient care and treatment in a psychiatric facility under certain circumstances; prohibiting a local department from placing a child in, delivering a child to, or failing to remove a child from a hospital, an emergency or inpatient facility under certain circumstances; authorizing a hospital, an emergency facility, or an inpatient facility to petition a court to compel a local department to remove a child from the hospital, emergency or inpatient facility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {744268/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings3819(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5533.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10620(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10624(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback