MD HB1381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the setting on fire or burning of oriented strand board for certain fire-fighting training.
Title
Environment - Fire-Fighting Training - Oriented Strand Board - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333228/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1381 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |