MD HB1374 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which a certain artificial or natural flavoring is added; and providing that a person that violates the prohibition on shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which an artificial or natural flavoring has been added is subject to a certain civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-03-10HouseHearing canceled (Economic Matters)
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation7213(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7214(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback