MD HB1373 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to employ legal counsel and a Chief Budget Analyst; providing for the terms of employment and salary of the legal counsel and Chief Budget Analyst; requiring the legal counsel to serve as the legal advisor to the County Board; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to review the County Board's budget and approve or return the budget with suggested changes; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to ensure that education spending is in accordance with the County Board's budget; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education4104(n/a)See Bill Text
Education4104.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback