MD HB1371 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a certain stop work order requiring the cessation of all business operations to certain employers for certain violations of certain wage and hour laws or workplace fraud laws; providing that a certain stop work order takes effect when served and remains in effect until the Commissioner issues an order releasing a certain stop work order; requiring the Commissioner to issue an order releasing a certain stop work order on a certain showing by an employer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB688 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment2105.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback