MD HB1370 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State, for certain construction projects and major renovation projects proposed after December 31, 2020, to require that the project be designed, engineered, and constructed in a manner that allows the roof to withstand the weight of solar panels; requiring certain construction projects and major renovation projects to include the placement of the maximum number of solar panels for which the project was designed; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to provide certain recommendations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB592 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement3602.2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement4809(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback