MD HB1368 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that the "filing of the application for divorce", for purposes of a provision of law authorizing a court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of a 12-month separation when the parties have met certain conditions before the filing of the application for divorce, includes an oral amendment made by a party with the consent of the other party at a hearing on the merits in open court to a previously filed application for limited or absolute divorce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-8) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 782
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment {218170/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-09SenateMotion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2018-04-06HouseDelegates Dumais, Malone, and Atterbeary
2018-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-06HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {218170/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (127-8)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {912216/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1368&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1368f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1368t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_782_hb1368t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1368_91221601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1368_21817001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1368.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1368_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0645.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1368_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1197.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1354.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback