MD HB1367 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation to conduct a study on extending Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) commuter rail service to western Maryland; requiring the Department to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (128-6)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {164862/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback