MD HB1366 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Harford County to impose, by law, and collect a sales and use tax on residential, nonresidential, and mobile telecommunications service in Harford County under certain circumstances; requiring that the tax be itemized on the telecommunications service bill and collected by the telecommunications service vendor on behalf of Harford County; providing that the net proceeds of the tax may be used only for expenditures of the Harford County public school system; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Telecommunications Service Tax - Authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-03-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government20610(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback