MD HB1366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Harford County to impose, by law, and collect a sales and use tax on residential, nonresidential, and mobile telecommunications service in Harford County under certain circumstances; requiring that the tax be itemized on the telecommunications service bill and collected by the telecommunications service vendor on behalf of Harford County; providing that the net proceeds of the tax may be used only for expenditures of the Harford County public school system; etc.
Title
Harford County - Telecommunications Service Tax - Authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Harford County
Laws and Ordinances
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Harford County
Laws and Ordinances
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1366?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1366f.pdf |