MD HB1363 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission in the Department of Human Services; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study, evaluate, and coordinate services and programs to address multigenerational poverty; authorizing the Commission to implement certain programs and to partner with local jurisdictions, local action agencies, departments of social services, and/or local workforce develop areas to implement certain programs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services2301(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2601(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2602(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2603(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2604(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2605(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services2606(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback