MD HB1363 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a person making a specified appeal before a supervisor of assessments receive specified information from the Department of Assessments and Taxation regarding the property that is the subject of the appeal and a specified sales analysis at least 14 days before a hearing; requiring the Department to provide the information free of charge; repealing specified provisions of law relating to a request by a person making an appeal before a property tax assessment appeal board for specified information; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Appeals - Provision of Information to Taxpayers
Sponsors
Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Christian Miele [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
Del. Meagan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {249134/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appeals
Assessment Appeal Boards
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Fees
Hearings
Public Information
Taxes - Property
Assessment Appeal Boards
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Fees
Hearings
Public Information
Taxes - Property