MD HB1363 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of Liquor License Commissioners to reject a license renewal application if it is submitted after April 30 in any year.
Title
Baltimore City Board of Liquor License Commissioners - License Renewal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/26 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-02-21 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1363.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1363f.pdf |