MD HB1362 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law requiring that the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax be distributed to the county's agricultural land preservation program and to fund school site acquisition and school construction or certain indebtedness for school site acquisition and school construction; and authorizing the Harford County Council to determine, by law, the manner in which the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax are distributed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-03-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Harford County12351(n/a)See Bill Text
Harford County12352(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback