MD HB1360 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a person that holds a certain sewage sludge utilization permit and a certain groundwater discharge permit from the restrictions on the winter application of nutrients described in the Maryland Nutrient Management Manual.
Title
Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land Application
Sponsors
Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Fertilizers
Licenses
Sewage
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Fertilizers
Licenses
Sewage