MD HB136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring each State building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the State to meet the standards to the extent practicable and within budgetary constraints; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; and establishing that certain requirements do not apply to certain contracts or projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-40) (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (93-40)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {936284/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback