MD HB1356 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State, on request by the Town of Brentwood, Prince George's County, to assume ownership of Maryland Route 208 from Rhode Island Avenue to the border of the Town of Brentwood and the City of Hyattsville, Prince George's County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways – Maryland Route 208 – Jurisdiction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback