MD HB1356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State, on request by the Town of Brentwood, Prince George's County, to assume ownership of Maryland Route 208 from Rhode Island Avenue to the border of the Town of Brentwood and the City of Hyattsville, Prince George's County.
Title
Highways – Maryland Route 208 – Jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Transportation
Transportation - Highways