MD HB1355 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county or municipality to satisfy a requirement to publish legal notices in a newspaper of general circulation by posting the notices on its Web site; requiring notices posted on a county or municipality Web site to be conspicuously displayed and be easily accessible; requiring a county or municipality that chooses to post notices on the Internet to publish specified advance notice in a newspaper of general circulation in the county or municipality and to offer a specified mail service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-22 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2012-02-28 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-27 Re-referred Environmental Matters
2012-02-16 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback