MD HB1354 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "taxable service" under the sales and use tax to impose the tax on certain services; providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or certain aircraft systems, and for certain qualified data center personal property for use at qualified data centers; requiring the Department of Commerce to verify certain eligibility; requiring the Comptroller to issue certain certificates of eligibility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 46 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {709434/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (76-46)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFloor Committee Amendment {555860/1 Adopted
2020-03-10HouseMotion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {395069/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11236(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11237(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property7246(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback