MD HB1354 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to provide that a specified grant for the Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1354.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1354f.pdf |