MD HB1354 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to take specified actions before proposing to adopt or make changes to specified regulations and laws governing the construction of water wells; prohibiting the Department from proposing to adopt specified changes to regulations and laws governing the construction of wells unless the State Board of Well Drillers approves the changes; providing an exception; etc.
Title
Environment - Construction of Wells
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Cane) Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Cane) Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-05 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-02 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-21 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-21 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Cane) Adopted (121-0) | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Legislation
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Wells
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Legislation
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Wells