MD HB1354 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $50,000,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Calvert County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Bonding Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-3)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {984561/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback